MO HR8 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the use of the House Chamber for the Missouri Youth Leadership Forum for Students with Disabilities on July 20, 2023
Title
Grants the use of the House Chamber for the Missouri Youth Leadership Forum for Students with Disabilities on July 20, 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR8&year=2023&code=R |
Text | http://reflect.legiscan.com/Proxy.php |