MO HR4907 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Adopted (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 120 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Adopted (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 120 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Title
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: HR 4907 HOUSE RESOLUTIONS (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Adopted (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 120 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3 |
2018-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Offered (H) |