MO HR4839 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urges the House of Representatives to recommend that any House Committee addressing proposals regarding the rebuilding of I-70 consider the integration of elements designed to promote the state’s natural beauty by protecting the visual and scenic qualities of Missouri roadways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges the House of Representatives to recommend that any House Committee addressing proposals regarding the rebuilding of I-70 consider the integration of elements designed to promote the state’s natural beauty by protecting the visual and scenic qualities of Missouri roadways.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-23HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-04-23HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-18HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-07HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-03-07HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-28HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-18HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2018-01-03HouseOffered (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback