MO HR4050 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the use of the chamber for the Missouri Governor's Student Leadership Forum on February 16, 2024, and February 17, 2024, from noon to 4:00 p.m.
Title
Grants the use of the chamber for the Missouri Governor's Student Leadership Forum on February 16, 2024, and February 17, 2024, from noon to 4:00 p.m.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Offered (H) |