MO HR3995 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants use of the House Chamber to TeenPact on Friday, April 1, 2022, from 1:00 pm to 4:00 pm
Title
Grants use of the House Chamber to TeenPact on Friday, April 1, 2022, from 1:00 pm to 4:00 pm
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR3995&year=2022&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/5891H.01I.pdf |