MO HR3396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants use of the House Chamber to the Missouri Catholic Conference on October 1, 2022, from 7 am to 5 pm
Title
Grants use of the House Chamber to the Missouri Catholic Conference on October 1, 2022, from 7 am to 5 pm
Sponsors
Rep. Rudy Veit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2022-01-24 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HR3396&year=2022&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills221/hlrbillspdf/5185H.01I.pdf |