MO HR210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 8
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Adopted (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 8
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages and urges Major League Soccer to give serious consideration to placing one of its expansion teams in St. Louis
Title
Encourages and urges Major League Soccer to give serious consideration to placing one of its expansion teams in St. Louis
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: HR 210 HOUSE RESOLUTIONS (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted (H) - AYES: 138 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 8 |
2019-03-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Offered (H) |