MO HJR90 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the establishment of a six-day early voting period before a general election
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the establishment of a six-day early voting period before a general election
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-14 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 92 NOES: 57 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 94 NOES: 57 |
2014-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 8 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 8 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 28, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Loungel |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-17 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 24 |
2014-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1 to ha 1, ha 1 as amended adopted |
2014-04-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |