MO HJR72 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs a percentage of medical marijuana tax revenue to a dedicated fund for University of Missouri School of Law Veterans Clinic.
Title
Directs a percentage of medical marijuana tax revenue to a dedicated fund for University of Missouri School of Law Veterans Clinic.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR72&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3619H.01I.pdf |