MO HJR54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring ballots to merge or dissolve cities or counties only be approved if those cities or counties approve the ballot.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring ballots to merge or dissolve cities or counties only be approved if those cities or counties approve the ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: HJR 54 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 13, 2019, 1 p.m., Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 10, 2019, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Progress and Development(S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2019-04-30 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |