MO HJR47 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 1 TO SA 1 OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 1 TO SA 1 OFFERED
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that a person seeking to vote in a public election may be required by general law to provide valid government-issued photo identification
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that a person seeking to vote in a public election may be required by general law to provide valid government-issued photo identification
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] | Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 1 TO SA 1 OFFERED |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 50 |
2014-02-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 51 |
2014-02-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-10 | House | Prefiled (H) |