MO HJR41 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for the number of House of Representative and Senate districts.
Title
Modifies provisions for the number of House of Representative and Senate districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - May 9, 2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |