MO HJR38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to assert the right of Missourians to hunt and fish
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to assert the right of Missourians to hunt and fish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |