MO HJR34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-05 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to limit general revenue appropriations and mandate state income tax rate reductions in certain situations
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to limit general revenue appropriations and mandate state income tax rate reductions in certain situations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - HJR 34 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 29, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-30 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |