MO HJR31 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting a state court from using any international law or Sharia law
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting a state court from using any international law or Sharia law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2011-02-28 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR31&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HJR0031I.htm |