MO HJR11 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment to prohibit checkpoints and road blocks, except in certain emergency situations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment to prohibit checkpoints and road blocks, except in certain emergency situations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-04-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: Downsizing State Government(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback