MO HJR100 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies constitutional provisions relating to funding for the Kansas City Police Department
Title
Modifies constitutional provisions relating to funding for the Kansas City Police Department
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |