MO HJR1 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that a person seeking to vote in a public election may be required by general law to provide a valid government-issued photo identification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment specifying that a person seeking to vote in a public election may be required by general law to provide a valid government-issued photo identification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - HJR 1 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - HJR 1 HJRs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2015-04-27SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2015-04-23SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2015-04-23SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2015-04-22SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 23, 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2015-04-21SenateReferred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2015-04-16SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2015-04-15SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2015-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2015-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 13, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2015-02-25SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S)
2015-02-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2015-02-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
2015-02-19HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2015-02-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2015-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-02-18HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2015-02-18HousePerfected (H)
2015-02-18HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2015-02-05HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2015-02-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-02-03HouseReferred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
2015-02-03HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2015-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-01-15HouseReferred: Elections(H)
2015-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-07HouseRead First Time (H)
2014-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback