MO HCR60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the United States government to condemn the persecution of Falun Gong practitioners
Title
Urges the United States government to condemn the persecution of Falun Gong practitioners
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCR60&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5026H.02I.pdf |