MO HCR58 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 28 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves the State Tax Commission's proposed regulation to establish agricultural and horticultural land values for 2017 and 2018
Title
Disapproves the State Tax Commission's proposed regulation to establish agricultural and horticultural land values for 2017 and 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HCR 58 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - HCR 58 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, January 26, 2016, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-01-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |