MO HCR49 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms Missouri's support of flood control and navigation being the dominant Congressionally authorized purposes for operation of the Missouri River
Title
Reaffirms Missouri's support of flood control and navigation being the dominant Congressionally authorized purposes for operation of the Missouri River
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HCR49&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/2353H.01I.pdf |