MO HCR43 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Trade and Tourism(H)
Pending: House Trade and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred: Trade and Tourism(H)
Pending: House Trade and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 15, 2015, as "American Red Cross Minority Blood Drive Day" in Missouri
Title
Designates May 15, 2015, as "American Red Cross Minority Blood Drive Day" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred: Trade and Tourism(H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR43&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HCR0043I.PDF |