MO HCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Formally denounces the infamous Dred Scott decision
Title
Formally denounces the infamous Dred Scott decision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House: HCR 4 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Adopted (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 20, 9 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics(S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HA 1 Adopted AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |