MO HCR39 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses the sentiments of the Missouri Legislature over prospective federal legislation that would amend portions of the Fair Labor Standards Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses the sentiments of the Missouri Legislature over prospective federal legislation that would amend portions of the Fair Labor Standards Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-29HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-29HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-04HouseReferred: Workforce Development(H)
2021-02-22HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-19HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback