MO HCR26 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Committee on Solid Waste Management District Operations
Title
Establishes the Joint Committee on Solid Waste Management District Operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |