MO HCR18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges public schools to institute JROTC in their schools.
Title
Urges public schools to institute JROTC in their schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HCR 18 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HCR 18 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Adopted (S) |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 9, 2019, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics(S) |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported to the Senate (S) |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted AYES: 153 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |