MO HCR12 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - Referred: Rules(H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Title
Endorses continued support of the relationship and shared interests between Taiwan and the State of Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: International Trade(H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR12&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HCR0012I.htm |