MO HCB12 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Children and Families AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the protection of vulnerable persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the protection of vulnerable persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseReturned to Committee of Origin (H) - Children and Families AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-03HouseVoted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H)
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-29HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-03-29HouseRead Second Time (H) - 0
2018-03-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)
2018-03-28HouseReported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-27HouseVoted to Introduce (H)
2018-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-03-13HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2018-03-06HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2018-02-15HouseAuthorized - Delivered to the Standing Committee on Children and Families

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback