MO HCB1 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to judicial proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to judicial proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - House: HCB 1 HCBs for THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2017-05-11SenateExecutive Session Scheduled
2017-05-11SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2017-04-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-27HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 AYES: 125 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1
2017-04-27HouseTaken Up
2017-04-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-26HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-04-25HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3 as amended,HA 4, HA 5 adopted
2017-04-25HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-04-25HouseTaken Up
2017-04-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-03-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-16HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)
2017-03-15HouseReported for Introduction (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-14HouseVoted to Introduce (H)
2017-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-28HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2017-02-15HouseAuthorized - Delivered to Committee on Judiciary

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback