MO HB998 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Police Use of Force Transparency Act"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Police Use of Force Transparency Act"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-02HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Crime Prevention(H)
2021-02-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-02-01HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback