MO HB991 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Second read and referred: Ways and Means(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts federal economic impact payments from state income tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts federal economic impact payments from state income tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 991 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 991 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateSecond read and referred: Ways and Means(S)
2021-04-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-04-12HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-12HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-04-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-08HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-04-07HousePerfected (H)
2021-04-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-04-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-04-01HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-10HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-04HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2021-01-29HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB991&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1929H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1929H.01P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1929H01.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1929H01.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1929H01.03H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0991I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1929H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0991C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1929H.01P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0991P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/051.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/051.005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback