MO HB982 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission to employ Missouri Capitol Police Officers for public safety at the seat of state government.
Title
Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission to employ Missouri Capitol Police Officers for public safety at the seat of state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: HB 982 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 982 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: HB 982 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |