MO HB98 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from June 30, 2011, to December 31, 2015, the 50-cent fee that is collected on the retail sale of a lead-acid battery as well as the fees for any hazardous waste generated
Title
Extends from June 30, 2011, to December 31, 2015, the 50-cent fee that is collected on the retail sale of a lead-acid battery as well as the fees for any hazardous waste generated
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |