MO HB965 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the recycling of hazardous secondary zinc materials, which can be used as fertilizer
Title
Allows for the recycling of hazardous secondary zinc materials, which can be used as fertilizer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2017-02-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB965&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1990H.01I.pdf |