MO HB960 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence.
Title
Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB960&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2032H.01I.pdf |