MO HB960 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain individuals from possessing a firearm due to domestic violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-04-02HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-02-18HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback