MO HB96 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows persons authorized to carry firearms under chapter 571 to sue for certain injuries sustained on the property of business enterprises that voluntarily prohibit firearms
Title
Allows persons authorized to carry firearms under chapter 571 to sue for certain injuries sustained on the property of business enterprises that voluntarily prohibit firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB96&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0523H.03I.pdf |