MO HB959 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions of the Motor Vehicle Franchise Practices Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions of the Motor Vehicle Franchise Practices Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 959 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 959 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: HB 959 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 141 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseTaken Up
2019-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2019-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1
2019-05-17SenateSS Adopted (S)
2019-05-17SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-17SenateTaken Up
2019-04-25SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
2019-04-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-01HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-01HouseTaken Up
2019-03-27HousePerfected (H)
2019-03-27HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-03-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-27HouseTaken Up
2019-03-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-05HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-05HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-02-18HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB959&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966S.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966S.04F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1966S.04T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/044.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.068.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.067.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1649
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1649

Bill Comments

feedback