MO HB954 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Government Efficiency and Downsizing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Subdivision Property Owners' Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Subdivision Property Owners' Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-03-23HouseReferred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
2023-01-26HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback