MO HB948 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the sunsets on certain tax credits related to agricultural purposes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the sunsets on certain tax credits related to agricultural purposes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 948 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: HB 948 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 49 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-05-12SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-05-12SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-05-12SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-05-11SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 12, 9:00 a.m., SCR 2
2021-05-10SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2021-05-10SenateSS Adopted (S) - with SA 1, SA 2, and SA 3
2021-05-10SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2021-05-10SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-04-29SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 29, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1
2021-04-27SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2021-04-26SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-21SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-21SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 13, 2021, 12:00 noon, Senate Lounge
2021-03-25SenateSecond read and referred: Economic Development(S)
2021-03-22SenateHouse Message (H)
2021-03-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-03-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 5
2021-03-11HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-03-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-03-09HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2021-03-09HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-09HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-08HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-02HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-04HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2021-01-29HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB948&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2107H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2107H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2107S.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/2107S.06F.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.07H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/2107H01.10H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0948I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2107H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0948C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2107H.01P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0948P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2107S.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/2107S.06A.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/036.001.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/038.019.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback