MO HB945 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes legal counsel for the Department of Mental Health to have standing in certain hearings involving a person unable to stand trial due to lack of mental fitness
Title
Authorizes legal counsel for the Department of Mental Health to have standing in certain hearings involving a person unable to stand trial due to lack of mental fitness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB945&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1921H.01I.pdf |