MO HB944 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the law regarding firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the law regarding firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 116 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 110 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 944 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 107 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2021-04-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3 as amended, HA 4 Adopted,
2021-04-12HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-04-12HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-04-12HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-04-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-07HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-22HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-25HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-25HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-04HouseReferred: Rural Community Development(H)
2021-01-28HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB944&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1836H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1836H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1836H.02P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.14H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.15H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.10H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.11H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.18H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.20H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.21H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.22H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.23H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1836H02.24H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0944I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1836H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0944C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1836H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1836H.02P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0944P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/051.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/051.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/051.009.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback