MO HB931 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new provisions relating to joint employers
Title
Establishes new provisions relating to joint employers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |