MO HB923 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a seller of real property to disclose in writing to a buyer any abandoned or unplugged wells or cisterns
Title
Requires a seller of real property to disclose in writing to a buyer any abandoned or unplugged wells or cisterns
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB923&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1267H.01I.pdf |