MO HB922 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the statute of limitations for personal injury claims from five years to two years
Title
Modifies the statute of limitations for personal injury claims from five years to two years
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Houx [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House: HB 922 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA1 to HA5, HA 5 as amended, HA 6, HA 1 to HA 7, HA 7 as amended adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Title AYES: 105 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 4 |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up |
2021-04-12 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |