MO HB91 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies that a person cannot be required to become or refrain from becoming a member of or paying dues to a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that a person cannot be required to become or refrain from becoming a member of or paying dues to a labor organization as a condition or continuation of employment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-19 - House - House: HB 91 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: HB 91 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: HB 91 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 61 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-03-15SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-03-08SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-03-07SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 8, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1
2017-02-02SenateSecond read and referred: Senate General Laws(S)
2017-01-19HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-01-19HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 100 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-19HouseTaken Up
2017-01-18HousePerfected (H)
2017-01-18HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-01-18HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating solely to labor organizations, was agreed to.
2017-01-18HouseTaken Up
2017-01-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-01-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2017-01-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback