MO HB906 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the practices of cosmetology and barbering do not include shampooing
Title
Provides that the practices of cosmetology and barbering do not include shampooing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB906&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1841H.01I.pdf |