MO HB905 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner
Title
Prohibits villages, towns, and cities from regulating dogs in a breed-specific manner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |