MO HB90 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Narcotics Control Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Narcotics Control Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 111 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (*HA 2, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 68 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 (HA 4) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: HB 90 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-05-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-05-11HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2017-05-11HouseConferees Re-appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, ENGLER, MORRIS, QUADE, WESSELS
2017-05-11HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-05-11HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHATZ, KRAUS, SATER, HUMMEL, WALSH
2017-05-11HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-05-11HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-05-11HouseSenate Grants Conference (S)
2017-05-11HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-05-11HouseHouse Requests a Further Conference (H)
2017-05-11HouseTaken Up
2017-05-09HouseLaid Over (H)
2017-05-09HouseConference Committee Dissolved
2017-05-09HouseTaken Up
2017-05-09HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-05-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES REHDER, ENGLER, MORRIS, QUADE, WESSELS
2017-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-05-08HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SCHATZ, KRAUS, SATER, SCHUPP, HUMMEL
2017-05-08HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2017-04-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-04-18HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS as amended
2017-04-18HouseTaken Up
2017-04-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-18HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-04-18SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2017-04-13SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 to SA 2, SA 2 as amended, SSA 1 for SA 3, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, adopted
2017-04-13SenateSS Adopted (S)
2017-04-13SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2017-04-13SenateTaken Up
2017-04-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-12SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 13, 2017, 8:15am, Bingham Conference Room
2017-04-11SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2017-04-10SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2017-04-06SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 6, 2017, 8:00am, Senate Lounge
2017-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2017-04-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 54 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-03HouseTaken Up
2017-04-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-30HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-03-29HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2017-03-29HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-03-29HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-03-29HouseTaken Up
2017-03-29HouseLaid Over (H) - HA 1/HCS pending
2017-03-29HouseTaken Up
2017-03-28HouseLaid Over (H)
2017-03-28HouseTaken Up
2017-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-20HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-20HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-31HouseReferred: Insurance Policy(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB90&year=2017&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0046H.01I.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0046H.02C.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0046H.02P.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0046S.09F.pdf
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0046H.17S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/047.006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/047.005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/047.004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/047.003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/049.009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/049.008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback