MO HB898 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a "Back the Blue" special license plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a "Back the Blue" special license plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 898 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-09SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-04-23SenateSenate Message (S)
2019-04-18SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-04-18SenateTaken Up
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
2019-04-11SenateVoted Do Pass Consent (S)
2019-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 5
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePerfected (H)
2019-04-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-02HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2019-02-13HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback